+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0436)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB741ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB741H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104671D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 16104671D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103780D
+ − Votes (10)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor