+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S4
Sponsored by E. Williams
Amendment S1
Sponsored by E. Williams
Amendment S2
Sponsored by E. Williams
Amendment S3
Sponsored by E. Williams
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor