+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reviewed by the Governor
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- The vote by which SJR3 Passed was expunged.
- EXPUNGED
- Motion for the Clincher was withdrawn
- Motion for the Clincher
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and adopted.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by McCollum
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
February 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
February 13, 2019: Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 4
January 29, 2019: Read the third time and adopted.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor