+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned From the House as concurred in.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and adopted.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor