+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as concurred in.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
- Returned To Senate concurred in.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and adopted.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor