+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reviewed by the Governor
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as concurred in.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
- Returned To Senate concurred in.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and adopted.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor