+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died in House committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and adopted.
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Baker
Amendment S2
Sponsored by G. Baker