+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reviewed and approved by the Governor.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned From the House as concurred in.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To Senate concurred in.
- Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and adopted.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor