+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Returned From the House as requested.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as requested.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. King
+ − Vote
March 27, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor