+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB97 is now Act 336
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Hawks
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 13, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13
January 23, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1