+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned from the Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Rules suspended.
- Returned From the House as requested.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as requested.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Senate requests the return of SB97 from the House.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor