+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB961 is now Act 1261
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. King
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 17
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor