+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB95 is now Act 977
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 14
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor