+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB94 is now Act 43
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
January 30, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35