+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB93 is now Act 131
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Rules suspended.
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2012: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
February 21, 2012: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1