+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB922 is now Act 1017
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 2
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor