+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB902 is now Act 1094
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- EXPUNGED
- Read third time and failed to pass.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by A. Clark
Amendment S3
Sponsored by A. Clark
Amendment S1
Sponsored by A. Clark
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 24
April 2, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2013: Read third time and failed to pass.
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor