+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB897 is now Act 1160
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 13
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor