+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB877 is now Act 1221
- Notification that SB877 is now Act 1221
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Scott
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hickey
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
March 27, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 29
March 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor