+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB866 is now Act 1256
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Kerr
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Sample
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
April 9, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 17
April 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor