+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB848 is now Act 1023
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Johnson
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 31
March 16, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor