+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB842 is now Act 1128
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Present/NV: 20
March 16, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor