+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB820 is now Act 1084
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Not Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Burnett
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Burnett
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Burnett
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 18
April 2, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor