+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB816 is now Act 802
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-reffered to Joint Energy
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 15
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor