+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB791 is now Act 1411
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 and 4
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 and 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Rules suspended.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S4
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Files
Amendment S3
Sponsored by B. Sample
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Sample
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (101)
Type:
Primary Sponsor