+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB757 is now Act 560
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by E. Williams
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 15
March 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor