+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB756 is now Act 573
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 27
March 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7