+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB755 is now Act 572
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 20
March 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor