+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB74 is now Act 67
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 &2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 & 2
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
January 26, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35