+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reurned to the Senate having been VETOED by the Governor
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 35
April 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor