+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn by author.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as requested.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as requested.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
January 28, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor