+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Senate having been VETOED by the Governor
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. King
Amendment H1
Sponsored by C. Douglas
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 17, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 25
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor