+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB696 is now Act 715
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Rules suspended.
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 14
March 21, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor