+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB694 is now Act 1122
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Gates
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 19
March 14, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor