+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB688 is now Act 900
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the Calendar.
- Rep. Michelle Gray objected to second reading.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by M. Gray
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Caldwell
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Caldwell
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 22
March 12, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2