+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB681 is now Act 525
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 and # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 & 2
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by A. Clark
Amendment S1
Sponsored by A. Clark
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 32
March 17, 2015: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 28
March 11, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor