+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB663 is now Act 1055
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as amended, Amendment #1.
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: House H1 Boyd 4/19/2021 6:16:26 PM PDF
Sponsored by Boyd
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
April 19, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor