+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB662 is now Act 945
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor