+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB66 is now Act 133
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. English
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
February 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35