+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB657 is now Act 1087
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor