+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB656 is now Act 943
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 6
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor