+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB655 is now Act 1316
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Wyatt
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
April 5, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35