+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB651 is now Act 813
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Sanders
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 13
March 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4