+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB644 is now Act 974
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Rules suspended.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB644 passed. Motion passed.
- The vote by which SB644 Passed was expunged.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: Senate S1 K. Hammer 4/13/2021 2:35:12 PM PDF
Sponsored by K. Hammer
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 10
April 13, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
April 13, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor