+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB642 is now Act 1247
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
April 3, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor