+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB634 is now Act 788
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Sanders
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 18
March 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor