+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 15, 2021 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Motion to Suspend the Rules to place SB633 on the calendar on April 21, 2021.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: Senate S1 T. Garner 4/20/2021 1:25:57 PM PDF
Sponsored by T. Garner
+ − Vote
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor