+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB632 is now Act 1085
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by S. Meeks
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35