+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 15, 2021 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: Senate S1 Hester 4/9/2021 3:56:58 PM PDF
Sponsored by Hester
+ − Vote
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1