+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as Failed to Pass
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
- Returned to the Senate.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 18
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor